EP1098403 - Device for processing a plurality of laser beams [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2007 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOMA-TECH Parc d'Affaires des Portes, Chaussée du Vexin 27100 Val de Reuil / FR | [2007/06] |
Former [2001/19] | For all designated states Automa-Tech Parc d'Affaires des Portes, Chaussée du Vexin 27100 Val de Reuil / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Charbonnier, Serge 22 rue Grande 27120 Chambray / FR | 02 /
Boureau, Damien 31, rue Stanislas Girardin 76000 Rouen / FR | [2001/19] | Representative(s) | Dronne, Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Dronne, Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 Rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2001/19] | Dronne, Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00402848.6 | 16.10.2000 | [2001/19] | Priority number, date | FR19990013656 | 02.11.1999 Original published format: FR 9913656 | [2001/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1098403 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1098403 | Date: | 07.02.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/00, G02B27/10, B23K26/067 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
B23K26/0673 (EP,US);
H01L21/027 (KR);
B23K26/0613 (EP,US);
B23K26/067 (EP,US);
G02B27/144 (EP,US);
G02B27/145 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/19] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Behandlung einer Anzahl von Laserstrahlen | [2001/19] | English: | Device for processing a plurality of laser beams | [2001/19] | French: | Dispositif d'élaboration d'une pluralité de faisceaux laser | [2001/19] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/37] | 30.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.02.2007 | DK | 07.02.2007 | FI | 07.02.2007 | IE | 07.02.2007 | NL | 07.02.2007 | SE | 07.05.2007 | GR | 08.05.2007 | PT | 09.07.2007 | GB | 16.10.2007 | IT | 16.10.2007 | LU | 16.10.2007 | ES | 17.10.2007 | BE | 31.10.2007 | CH | 31.10.2007 | FR | 31.10.2007 | LI | 31.10.2007 | MC | 31.10.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/33] | CY | 07.02.2007 | |
DK | 07.02.2007 | ||
FI | 07.02.2007 | ||
IE | 07.02.2007 | ||
NL | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
GR | 08.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | ||
GB | 16.10.2007 | ||
IT | 16.10.2007 | ||
ES | 17.10.2007 | ||
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
FR | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/23] | DK | 07.02.2007 | |
FI | 07.02.2007 | ||
IE | 07.02.2007 | ||
NL | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
GR | 08.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | ||
GB | 16.10.2007 | ||
IT | 16.10.2007 | ||
ES | 17.10.2007 | ||
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
FR | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 07.02.2007 | |
FI | 07.02.2007 | ||
IE | 07.02.2007 | ||
NL | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
GR | 08.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | ||
GB | 16.10.2007 | ||
IT | 16.10.2007 | ||
ES | 17.10.2007 | ||
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/03] | DK | 07.02.2007 | |
FI | 07.02.2007 | ||
IE | 07.02.2007 | ||
NL | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
GR | 08.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | ||
GB | 16.10.2007 | ||
IT | 16.10.2007 | ||
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/43] | DK | 07.02.2007 | |
FI | 07.02.2007 | ||
IE | 07.02.2007 | ||
NL | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
GR | 08.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | ||
IT | 16.10.2007 | ||
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/35] | DK | 07.02.2007 | |
FI | 07.02.2007 | ||
IE | 07.02.2007 | ||
NL | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
GR | 08.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | ||
IT | 16.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/26] | DK | 07.02.2007 | |
FI | 07.02.2007 | ||
IE | 07.02.2007 | ||
NL | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
GR | 08.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | ||
IT | 16.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | DK | 07.02.2007 | |
FI | 07.02.2007 | ||
IE | 07.02.2007 | ||
NL | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
GR | 08.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | ||
IT | 16.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | DK | 07.02.2007 | |
FI | 07.02.2007 | ||
IE | 07.02.2007 | ||
NL | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
GR | 08.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | DK | 07.02.2007 | |
FI | 07.02.2007 | ||
IE | 07.02.2007 | ||
NL | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | DK | 07.02.2007 | |
FI | 07.02.2007 | ||
NL | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | FI | 07.02.2007 | |
NL | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | FI | 07.02.2007 | |
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 07.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4797696 (ALLEN PAUL C [US], et al) [A] 1* figures 1,3 *; | [A]US5933216 (DUNN THOMAS J [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * |