Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
20.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2003 [2003/32] |
02.04.2003 | Change - extension states | |
24.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
06.12.2002 | Definitive list of designations | published on 22.01.2003 [2003/04] |
04.12.2002 | Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) | |
04.12.2002 | Period of grace (R.85b EPC1973) | |
05.11.2002 | Renewal fee | |
15.03.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 02.05.2002 [2002/18] |