Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7984471 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2011 | B2 | US2004078826 | 22.04.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP00402921 | 23.10.2000 | EP0112333 | 18.10.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20030045108 | Global Dossier | 09.06.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | EP00402921 | 23.10.2000 | EP0112333 | 18.10.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004512772 | Global Dossier | 22.04.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | EP00402921 | 23.10.2000 | EP0112333 | 18.10.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1329083 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2009 | B1 | EP1329083 | 23.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP00402921 | 23.10.2000 | EP0112333 | 18.10.2001 | EP01989002 | 18.10.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2065802 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | EP00402921 | 23.10.2000 | EP0112333 | 18.10.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60139332D1 | 03.09.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP00402921 | 23.10.2000 | EP0112333 | 18.10.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA03003505 | 07.08.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | EP00402921 | 23.10.2000 | EP0112333 | 18.10.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0235791 | Global Dossier | 02.05.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP00402921 | 23.10.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1202520 | Global Dossier | 02.05.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP00402921 | 23.10.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100496042C | 03.06.2009 | C | CN1471782 | 28.01.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | EP00402921 | 23.10.2000 |