EP1202520 - Method and device for data transmission in a television system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2003 [2003/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON multimedia 46 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [2002/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lesenne, Laurent Thomson Multimedia, 46 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | 02 /
Pasquier, Frédéric Thomson Multimedia, 46 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | [2002/18] | Representative(s) | Kohrs, Martin, et al TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/18] | Kohrs, Martin, et al Thomson multimedia 46, quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne-Billancourt Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 00402921.1 | 23.10.2000 | [2002/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1202520 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/58, H04N5/445, H04N7/088 | [2002/18] | CPC: |
H04N21/64322 (EP,US);
H04N7/14 (KR);
H04L65/1104 (EP,KR);
H04L65/611 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04N21/238 (EP,US);
H04N21/2381 (EP,US);
H04N21/4381 (EP,US);
H04N21/858 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/04] |
Former [2002/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Datenübertragung in einem Fernsehsystem | [2002/18] | English: | Method and device for data transmission in a television system | [2002/18] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de transmission de données dans un système de télévision | [2002/18] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/32] | 03.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.12.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.12.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.12.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.12.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.12.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.12.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.12.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.12.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.12.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.12.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 10.12.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.12.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.12.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.12.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.12.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.12.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.12.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.12.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.12.2002 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5694163 (HARRISON EDWARD R [US]) [A] 1,5,7* column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 15 *; | [A]WO9955088 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,5,7 * page 3, line 7 - line 16 * * page 7, line 6 - page 8, line 1 *; | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "Advanced Television Enhancement Forum Specification (ATVEF), Version 1.1 revision 26, (02/02/99)", ATVEF, (19990202), XP002142259 [A] 1,5,7 * Chapter 3 * |