EP1108446 - Implantable active device of type multisite having means for resynchronization of ventricles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELA MEDICAL (Société anonyme) 98, Rue Maurice Arnoux 92541 Montrouge / FR | [2005/18] |
Former [2001/25] | For all designated states ELA MEDICAL (Société anonyme) 98, Rue Maurice Arnoux F-92541 Montrouge / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dal Molin, Renzo 7 Allée Mozart 92320 Chatillon / FR | 02 /
Ripart, Alain 17 rue de la Gruerie 91190 Gif sur Yvette / FR | [2001/25] | Representative(s) | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique, et al Bardehle Pagenberg SPE SAS SO Square Opéra 5, rue Boudreau 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/25] | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique, et al Avocat à la Cour, Cabinet Bardehle, Pagenberg & Partner, 14 boulevard Malesherbes 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00403481.5 | 12.12.2000 | [2001/25] | Priority number, date | FR19990016015 | 17.12.1999 Original published format: FR 9916015 | [2001/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1108446 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1108446 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/368, A61N1/365 | [2001/25] | CPC: |
A61N1/3627 (EP,US);
A61N1/36843 (EP,US);
A61N1/36521 (EP,US);
A61N1/3684 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/11] |
Former [2001/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Implantierbare aktive Vorrichtung des Typs multisite mit Mitteln zum Resynchronisieren der Ventrikeln | [2001/25] | English: | Implantable active device of type multisite having means for resynchronization of ventricles | [2001/25] | French: | Disposifif implantable actif de type multisite, comportant des moyens de resynchronisation des ventricules | [2001/25] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 19.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.05.2005 | FI | 04.05.2005 | NL | 04.05.2005 | TR | 04.05.2005 | DK | 04.08.2005 | GR | 04.08.2005 | ES | 15.08.2005 | PT | 17.10.2005 | CY | 12.12.2005 | LU | 31.12.2005 | MC | 31.12.2005 | [2007/20] |
Former [2007/08] | AT | 04.05.2005 | |
FI | 04.05.2005 | ||
NL | 04.05.2005 | ||
TR | 04.05.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
ES | 15.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 04.05.2005 | |
FI | 04.05.2005 | ||
NL | 04.05.2005 | ||
TR | 04.05.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
ES | 15.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 04.05.2005 | |
FI | 04.05.2005 | ||
NL | 04.05.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
ES | 15.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 04.05.2005 | |
FI | 04.05.2005 | ||
NL | 04.05.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
ES | 15.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 04.05.2005 | |
FI | 04.05.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
ES | 15.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 04.05.2005 | |
FI | 04.05.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 04.05.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0862927 (ELA MEDICAL SA [FR]) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 3 *[A] 3; | [XA]WO9930777 (MEDTRONIC INC [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9 * page 10, line 10 - line 21 * * page 14, line 14 - page 15, line 9 * * page 15, line 29 - page 16, line 1 * [A] 7,8 | by applicant | US5154171 |