EP1112768 - Panelling and supports for interconnected toy blocks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maddock, Paul T. 1320 Cartier Ville St. Laurent Quebec H4L 2N5 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2001/27] | For all designated states Maddock, Paul T. 1320 Cartier Ville St. Laurent, Quebec H4L 2N5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/27] | Representative(s) | Doireau, Marc, et al Cabinet ORES, 36,rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/27] | Doireau, Marc, et al Cabinet Orès 6, avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00403500.2 | 13.12.2000 | [2001/27] | Priority number, date | US19990170780P | 15.12.1999 Original published format: US 170780 P | US20000551605 | 17.04.2000 Original published format: US 551605 | [2001/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1112768 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1112768 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | [2002/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A63H33/04, A61C5/10, A63H33/08 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
A63H33/105 (EP,US);
A63H33/086 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/27] | A63H33/04 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/31] |
Former [2001/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Paneele und Träger für miteinander verbundene Spielbausteine | [2001/27] | English: | Panelling and supports for interconnected toy blocks | [2001/27] | French: | Panneaux et supports pour les éléments d'un jeu de construction interconnectés | [2001/27] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/02] | 08.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.06.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 17.06.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2577303 (YAMAKADO HIRAYUKI [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US3640017 (CHRISTIANSEN GODTFRED K) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]EP0189514 (HESSE KURT [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | US1281856 | US1883214 | US2633662 | US3827177 | US3657838 | US4764143 | US5527201 | US5775046 |