EP1111180 - Safety device for automatic gate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Systèmes d'automatismes Fermetures Industrielles et Rapides-SAFIR 14, Rue des Garennes 78440 Gargenville / FR | [2001/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bachmatiuk, Michel 2, rue des Bouvettes 78440 Issou / FR | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Wagret, Frédéric Cabinet Wagret 6, Avenue Daniel Lesueur 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | Wagret, Frédéric Cabinet Wagret, 19, rue de Milan 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00403510.1 | 13.12.2000 | [2001/26] | Priority number, date | FR19990016182 | 21.12.1999 Original published format: FR 9916182 | [2001/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1111180 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/10, E05F7/00, E06B11/02, E06B9/88, E05F15/00, H01H17/00 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
E05F15/48 (EP);
H01H17/12 (EP);
E05Y2201/654 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/12] |
Former [2001/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Sicherheitsvorrichtung für Automatiktor | [2001/26] | English: | Safety device for automatic gate | [2001/26] | French: | Dispositif de sécurité pour portail automatique | [2001/26] | Examination procedure | 24.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/09] | 24.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/32] | 11.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19533431 (GFA GES FUER ANTRIEBSTECHNIK D [DE]) [A] 1-3 * column 4, line 61 - column 5; figure - *; | [A]EP0911474 (D F M AUTOMAZIONE S N C DI DIG [IT]) [A] 1,3 * abstract * |