EP1110857 - Arrangement for stabilizing a vessel, especially in roll [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TECHNICATOME Société Technique pour l'Energie Atomique Centre d'Etudes de Saclay, B.P. 17 91192 Gif-sur-Yvette Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states TECHNICATOME Société Technique pour l'Energie Atomique Centre d'Etudes de Saclay, B.P. 17 91192 Gif-sur-Yvette Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chaix, Edmond 17, boulevard St Georges 04860 Pierrevert / FR | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Audier, Philippe André, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | Audier, Philippe André, et al Brevalex, 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/26] | Des Termes, Monique Société Brevatome 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00403572.1 | 18.12.2000 | [2001/26] | Priority number, date | FR19990016066 | 20.12.1999 Original published format: FR 9916066 | [2001/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1110857 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1110857 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | [2001/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1110857 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B63B39/02 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
B63B39/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2002/18] |
Former [2001/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Stabilisierung eines Schiffes, insbesondere beim Rollen | [2001/26] | English: | Arrangement for stabilizing a vessel, especially in roll | [2001/26] | French: | Dispositif d'équilibrage d'un navire, notamment en roulis | [2001/26] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 09.02.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.07.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 25.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.04.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE349886 (NAAMLOOZE VENNOOTSCHAP WERF CO) [Y] 1,2,4,5,7-11 * the whole document *; | [Y]US1853069 (NICOLAI MINORSKY) [Y] 1,2,4,5,7-11 * page 7, line 4 - line 68; figures 1-16 *; | [YD]FR2687978 (TECHNICATOME [FR]) [YD] 7-10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE324970 (VULCAN WERKE, et al) [A] 1,3 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]US3426718 (SLAGER JOHN J, et al) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]FR2322778 (SOUTHWESTERN IND INC [US]) [A] 7-10 * page 6, line 31 - page 7, line 8; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | FR2687978 |