22.08.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] |
14.12.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] |
05.01.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.02.2007 [2007/06] |
03.01.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
03.01.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
10.10.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.08.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.03.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.11.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.10.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.07.2005 |
Change - designated states |
published on 14.09.2005 [2005/37] |
23.07.2005 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
19.05.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
19.05.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
30.03.2005 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
25.01.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.01.2005 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 09.03.2005 [2005/10] |
18.01.2005 |
Deletion: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
18.01.2005 |
New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
11.01.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.10.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.10.2004 |
Change - representative |
published on 24.11.2004 [2004/48] |
03.09.2004 |
First examination report |
|
31.08.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.07.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] |
30.04.2004 |
Publication of search report |
published on 16.06.2004 [2004/25] |
17.10.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.09.2003 |
Change - representative |
published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
01.11.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.08.2001 |
Change - representative |
published on 26.09.2001 [2001/39] |
18.05.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.07.2001 [2001/27] |