Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001184956 | Global Dossier | 06.07.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | JP37323899 | 28.12.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU774021B | Global Dossier | 10.06.2004 | B2 | AU6668100 | 05.07.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | JP37323899 | 28.12.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1113508 | Global Dossier | 07.02.2007 | B1 | EP1113508 | 16.06.2004 | A3 | EP1113508 | 04.07.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP37323899 | 28.12.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60033265T | 25.10.2007 | T2 | DE60033265D1 | 22.03.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP37323899 | 28.12.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1113508T | 04.06.2007 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP37323899 | 28.12.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6493925 | 17.12.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP37323899 | 28.12.1999 |