EP1098355 - Powerdetector component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.A. 29, Boulevard Romain Rolland 92120 Montrouge / FR | [2001/51] |
Former [2001/19] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.A. 7, Avenue Galliéni 94250 Gentilly / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simonnet, Jean-Michel 10, Rue de la Moissonnière 37270 Veretz / FR | [2001/19] | Representative(s) | de Beaumont, Michel 1, rue Champollion 38000 Grenoble / FR | [2001/19] | Application number, filing date | 00410138.2 | 02.11.2000 | [2001/19] | Priority number, date | FR19990014011 | 03.11.1999 Original published format: FR 9914011 | [2001/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1098355 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1098355 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/747, H01L29/74 | [2006/45] | CPC: |
H01L29/747 (EP,US);
H01L29/7404 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/19] | H01L21/00, H01L29/747, H01L29/74 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/05] |
Former [2001/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Leistungsdetektor-Bauteil | [2001/19] | English: | Powerdetector component | [2001/19] | French: | Détecteur d'état de composant de puissance | [2001/19] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/51] | 20.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 19.03.2008 | DE | 20.06.2008 | GB | 02.11.2008 | FR | 30.11.2008 | [2011/45] |
Former [2010/01] | IT | 19.03.2008 | |
DE | 20.06.2008 | ||
GB | 02.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | IT | 19.03.2008 | |
DE | 20.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | DE | 20.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5889374 (PEZZANI ROBERT [FR]) [X] 1,5,6 * figure 5 * [A] 2-4; | [A]EP0709891 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [FR]) [A] 1-6 * figure 3 *; | [A]DE4316509 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]) [A] 1-6 * figures 4A,8 *; | [A]US5036377 (PATHAK VIJAY K [GB], et al) [A] 1-6 * figure 4 *; | [A]EP0721218 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [FR]) [A] 1-6 * figures 1A,2A,13A *; | [A]FR2773021 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [FR]) [A] 1-6 * figures 4-7 *; | [DA]EP0817277 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [FR]) [DA] 1-6 * figure 2A *; | [DA]EP0881672 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [FR]) [DA] 1-6 * figures 1,2 *; | [PX]EP0987751 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SA [FR]) [PX] 1 * figures 1-3 * |