EP1030130 - Towel drier with glass panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2004 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEB S.A. Les 4 M Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/34] | For all designated states SEB S.A. Les 4 M Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jacquemin, Philippe 19Bis, Rue du 11 Novembre 1918 69540 Irigny / FR | 02 /
Girard, Bruno 2, Allée des Magnolias 69390 Vourles / FR | 03 /
Germain, Jean Claude 9, rue Rosa Bonheur 69720 Saint Bonnet de Mure / FR | [2000/34] | Application number, filing date | 00420018.4 | 26.01.2000 | [2000/34] | Priority number, date | FR19990002264 | 19.02.1999 Original published format: FR 9902264 | [2000/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1030130 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1030130 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F24H3/00 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
A47K10/06 (EP);
F24H3/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/19] |
Former [2000/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Handtuchtrockner mit Glasswand | [2000/34] | English: | Towel drier with glass panel | [2000/34] | French: | Radiateur sèche serviettes à parois en verre | [2000/34] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/45] | 24.02.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE | 03.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.04.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4052588 (NAKAMURA TATSUJI, et al) [X] 1,3,5,6,8 * column W *; | [A]US4694146 (DEMARS ROBERT A [US]) [A] 1 * column A *; | [A]FR2731311 (COGIDEV [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | WO9627271 | DE4136134 | FR2652037 | FR2666475 | US4052588 | WO9814105 |