Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000278210 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19904248 | 03.02.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1026841 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE19904248 | 03.02.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2297939 | 03.08.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19904248 | 03.02.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19904248 | 10.08.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19904248 | 03.02.1999 |