EP1026841 - Transmitter for use in a dispersion supported transmission system and dispersion supported transmission system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.07.2003 [2003/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wedding, Berthold Dr. Hebbelstrasse 8 70825 Korntal-Münchingen / DE | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | Rausch, Gabriele, et al Alcatel Intellectual Property Department Stuttgart 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | Rausch, Gabriele, Dr., et al Alcatel Intellectual Property Department, Stuttgart Postfach 30 09 29 70449 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 00440013.1 | 21.01.2000 | [2000/32] | Priority number, date | DE1999104248 | 03.02.1999 Original published format: DE 19904248 | [2000/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1026841 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/32] | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/18 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
H04B10/2507 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sendemodul für den Einsatz in einem Dispersionsunterstützten Übertragungssystem sowie Dispersionsunterstütztes Übertragungssystem | [2000/32] | English: | Transmitter for use in a dispersion supported transmission system and dispersion supported transmission system | [2000/32] | French: | Emetteur pour système de transmission à support de dispersion et système de transmission à support de dispersion | [2000/32] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |