EP1055854 - Electromagnetic valve with a monolithic structure of ferromagnetic material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE CIVILE GROUPA 5 8 rue Salle le Comte 59300 Valenciennes / FR | [2004/36] |
Former [2000/48] | For all designated states Vinci, René 4 rue Raymond Bistors, Château Roussillon 66000 Perpignan / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vinci, René 4 rue Raymond Bistors-Château Roussillon 6600 Perpignan / FR | [2004/36] |
Former [2000/48] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Duthoit, Michel Georges André Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés 96/98, Boulevard Carnot B.P. 105 59027 Lille Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | Duthoit, Michel Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés, 96/98, Boulevard Carnot, B.P. 105 59027 Lille Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2004/34] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2000/48] | Rhein, Alain c/o Cabinet Bleger-Rhein, 8, Avenue Pierre Mendès France 67300 Schiltigheim / FR | Application number, filing date | 00440093.3 | 05.04.2000 | [2000/48] | Priority number, date | FR19990006918 | 28.05.1999 Original published format: FR 9906918 | [2000/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1055854 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1055854 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | [2002/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1055854 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/06 | [2000/48] | CPC: |
F16K31/0655 (EP);
F16K31/0651 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/48] | Title | German: | Elektromagnetisches Ventil mit einer monolitischen Struktur von ferromagnetischem Material | [2000/48] | English: | Electromagnetic valve with a monolithic structure of ferromagnetic material | [2000/48] | French: | Electrovanne à structure monolithique en matériau ferromagnétique | [2000/48] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/29] | 06.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 15.09.2004 | NL | 15.09.2004 | DK | 15.12.2004 | SE | 15.12.2004 | MC | 01.01.2005 | PT | 15.02.2005 | AT | 05.04.2005 | CY | 05.04.2005 | IE | 05.04.2005 | LU | 05.04.2005 | BE | 30.04.2005 | CH | 30.04.2005 | LI | 30.04.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/51] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
MC | 01.01.2005 | ||
AT | 05.04.2005 | ||
CY | 05.04.2005 | ||
IE | 05.04.2005 | ||
LU | 05.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
AT | 05.04.2005 | ||
CY | 05.04.2005 | ||
IE | 05.04.2005 | ||
LU | 05.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
AT | 05.04.2005 | ||
CY | 05.04.2005 | ||
IE | 05.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
LU | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/43] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
AT | 05.04.2005 | ||
CY | 05.04.2005 | ||
IE | 05.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/29] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CY | 05.04.2005 | ||
IE | 05.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 05.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 15.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3828818 (HUNT N) [Y] 4 * column 2, line 39 - line 58; figure 3 *; | [Y]EP0481608 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) [Y] 8* column 2, line 36 - line 40; figure . *; | [XAY]DE19727414 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 14 - line 68; figures 1,2A,2B * [A] 6,7 [Y] 4,8 |