14.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] |
16.11.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.12.2007 [2007/51] |
25.05.2007 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] |
19.01.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] |
22.09.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] |
16.06.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2006 [2006/29] |
19.05.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.06.2006 [2006/25] |
17.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
30.09.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] |
22.07.2005 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 07.09.2005 [2005/36] |
28.01.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] |
21.01.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2005 [2005/10] |
30.07.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] |
16.07.2004 |
Change - inventor |
published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] |
16.07.2004 |
Change - applicant |
published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] |
16.07.2004 |
Change - representative |
published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] |
14.07.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.07.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
02.07.2004 |
Change - representative |
published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] |
30.04.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.03.2004 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.07.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.06.2003 |
Change - extension states |
|
05.05.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.03.2003 |
First examination report |
|
01.03.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.02.2003 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] |
17.05.2002 |
Publication of search report |
published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] |
17.05.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.06.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.07.2001 [2001/29] |
13.10.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.11.2000 [2000/48] |