Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1055854 | Global Dossier | 15.09.2004 | B1 | EP1055854 | 03.07.2002 | A3 | EP1055854 | 29.11.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | FR9906918 | 28.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE276467T | 15.10.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR9906918 | 28.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60013692T | 29.09.2005 | T2 | DE60013692D1 | 21.10.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR9906918 | 28.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2228434T | 16.04.2005 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR9906918 | 28.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2794209 | 01.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9906918 | 28.05.1999 |