EP1053944 - PACKAGING METHOD AS WELL AS PACKAGE FOR PRESERVATION AND/OR COOKING OR REHEATING OF FOOD PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2003 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GROUPE GUILLIN Zone Industrielle F-25290 Ornans / FR | For all designated states SEALED AIR S.A. 53, Rue St. Denis 28230 Epernon Cedex / FR | [2000/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beaufils, Philippe 8, le Torrent No. 2 84210 St. Didier / FR | [2000/47] | Representative(s) | Littolff, Denis Meyer & Partenaires 2 rue de Dublin 67300 Schiltigheim / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/47] | Littolff, Denis Meyer & Partenaires, Conseils en Propriété Industrielle, Bureaux Europe, 20, place des Halles 67000 Strasbourg / FR | Application number, filing date | 00440143.6 | 19.05.2000 | [2000/47] | Priority number, date | FR19990006680 | 21.05.1999 Original published format: FR 9906680 | [2000/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1053944 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1053944 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65B25/22, B65D81/34 | [2000/47] | CPC: |
B65B25/22 (EP);
B65D81/3453 (EP);
B65D2205/00 (EP);
B65D2581/3433 (EP);
B65D2581/345 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/47] | Extension states | LT | 03.04.2001 | LV | 03.04.2001 | Title | German: | VERPACKUNGSVERFAHREN SOWIE VERPACKUNG ZUM KONSERVIEREN UND/ODER KOCHEN ODER AUFWÄRMEN VON NAHRUNGSMITTELN | [2000/47] | English: | PACKAGING METHOD AS WELL AS PACKAGE FOR PRESERVATION AND/OR COOKING OR REHEATING OF FOOD PRODUCTS | [2000/47] | French: | Procédé de conditionnement et conditionnement pour la conservation et/ou la cuisson ou le réchauffage de produits alimentaires | [2000/47] | Examination procedure | 16.10.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/22] | 06.07.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 31.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.08.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 28.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 03.04.2002 | CY | 31.05.2002 | SE | 03.07.2002 | [2004/10] |
Former [2003/17] | IE | 03.04.2002 | |
SE | 03.07.2002 | ||
Former [2002/42] | SE | 03.07.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5053594 (THOTA HAMSA A P [US], et al) [Y] 3,5 * column 8, line 8 - line 65; figure 6 *; | [Y]US5151568 (RIPPLEY MARTSEY D [US]) [Y] 1-7,9 * column 2, line 37 - column 4, line 44; figure - *; | [Y]FR2697713 (HAVETTE BERNARD [FR]) [Y] 1-7,9 * page 5, line 15 - page 10, line 8; figure - *; | [A]EP0701955 (GROUPE GUILLIN SA [FR]); | [DY]EP0732275 (GROUPE GUILLIN SA [FR]) [DY] 6,7 * column 13, line 28 - column 16, line 29; figure - *; | [A]EP0849309 (SIRAP GEMA SPA [IT]) | by applicant | EP0701995 | EP0732275 |