EP1061788 - Ducted cooling equipment housing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.01.2005 [2005/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2004/05] |
Former [2000/51] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mowat, Scott 14/62-64, Queens Park Road Bondi Junction, New South Wales 2022 / AU | 02 /
Counsell, Matthew Charles 49, Woodbine Crescent, Ryde New South Wales 2112 / AU | 03 /
Buchanan, Michael 33, Cobah Road, Arcadia New South Wales 2159 / AU | [2000/51] | Representative(s) | Rausch, Gabriele, et al Alcatel Intellectual Property Department Stuttgart 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/45] | Rausch, Gabriele, Dr., et al Alcatel Intellectual Property Department, Stuttgart 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2000/51] | Schäfer, Wolfgang Dreiss Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Gerokstrasse 6 70188 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 00440165.9 | 30.05.2000 | [2000/51] | Priority number, date | AU1999PP07498 | 16.06.1999 Original published format: AU PP749899 | AU20000035314 | 08.05.2000 Original published format: AU 3531400 | [2000/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1061788 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1061788 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | [2001/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1061788 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20, H02B1/56 | [2001/37] | CPC: |
H02B1/565 (EP);
H05K7/206 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/51] | H05K7/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2002/23] |
Former [2000/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gehäuse einer Anlage mit Kühlluftführung | [2000/51] | English: | Ducted cooling equipment housing | [2000/51] | French: | Boîtier d'équipement avec conduit de refroidissement | [2000/51] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/50] | 13.03.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.07.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 03.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.05.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3717540 (AUTZ & HERRMANN MASCHF [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 6 * * column 4, lines 39-42 *; | [X]DE2744664 (WEINLICH LEOPOLD) [X] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE2844672 (SEEWANG GEORG PROF) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2622470 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [A]DE2231469 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]GB2277767 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI]) |