Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.07.2003 [2003/31] |
19.03.2003 | Change - extension states | |
27.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
24.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
19.12.2002 | Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) | |
06.12.2002 | Period of grace (R.85b EPC1973) | |
03.12.2002 | Surcharge for renewal fee | |
22.11.2002 | Definitive list of designations | published on 08.01.2003 [2003/02] |
02.03.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.04.2002 [2002/16] |