EP1109336 - A method of initialisation of an optical transmitter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELLABS DENMARK A/S Lautrupbjerg 7-11 2750 Ballerup / DK | [2001/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sorensen, Soren Pilemosevej 11 2610 Rodovre / DK | [2001/25] | Representative(s) | Boesen, Johnny Peder, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2001/25] | Boesen, Johnny Peder, et al Hofman-Bang A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 00610092.9 | 14.09.2000 | [2001/25] | Priority number, date | DK19990001321 | 17.12.1999 Original published format: DK 132199 | [2001/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1109336 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1109336 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/155 | [2001/25] | CPC: |
H04B10/58 (EP);
H04B10/504 (EP);
H04B10/564 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Initialisierung eines optischen Senders | [2001/25] | English: | A method of initialisation of an optical transmitter | [2001/25] | French: | Procédé d'initialisation d'un émetteur optique | [2001/25] | Examination procedure | 22.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 28.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.06.2006 | BE | 07.06.2006 | CH | 07.06.2006 | CY | 07.06.2006 | FI | 07.06.2006 | IT | 07.06.2006 | LI | 07.06.2006 | NL | 07.06.2006 | SE | 07.09.2006 | GR | 08.09.2006 | IE | 14.09.2006 | LU | 14.09.2006 | ES | 18.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | PT | 07.11.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
IE | 14.09.2006 | ||
LU | 14.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
IE | 14.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
IE | 14.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 07.09.2006 | |
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 07.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5402433 (STISCIA JAMES J [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 2, line 38 - line 47 * * column 2, line 55 - line 68 *; | [A]US5502298 (GELLER WILLIAM L [US]) [A] 1,2* abstract *; | [A]US5689356 (RAINAL ATTILIO JOSEPH [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 45 * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]US5850303 (YAMAMOTO HIROAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 2, line 51 - line 60 * * column 3, line 12 - line 60 * * column 5, line 28 - line 48 * |