EP1045192 - A bottle holder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2002 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.2002 [2002/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEE ENTERPRISES LIMITED 3 The Narroways Bettystown, County Meath / IE | [2000/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McKenna, Maurice 3 The Narroways Bettystown, County Meath / IR | [2000/42] | Representative(s) | Schütte, Gearoid Cruickshank 8a Sandyford Business Centre Sandyford Dublin 18 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/42] | Schütte, Gearoid Cruickshank & Co., 1 Holles Street Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 00650035.9 | 17.04.2000 | [2000/42] | Priority number, date | IE19990000320 | 16.04.1999 Original published format: IE 990320 | [2000/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1045192 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1045192 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | [2000/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16M13/02 | [2000/42] | CPC: |
A45D40/0087 (EP);
A47F7/286 (EP);
B65D83/384 (EP);
F16M11/041 (EP);
F16M13/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2001/29] |
Former [2000/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Flaschenhalter | [2000/42] | English: | A bottle holder | [2000/42] | French: | Support pour bouteille | [2000/42] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/12] | 28.09.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.06.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.06.2001 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0774224 (FELAS S P A [IT]) [Y] 1 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 2 * * column 2, line 38 - line 41; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]FR2768906 (LUNDI MARDI MERCREDI [FR]) [Y] 1 * page 1, line 34 - page 2, line 13 * * page 6, line 11 - line 25; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]EP0812625 (TEE ENTERPRISES LTD [IE]) [AD] 1,7 * column 5, line 29 - line 36; figure 21 *; | [A]US3100065 (GROSS HILBERT W) [A] 1,2,7 * column 2, line 25 - line 37; figure 1 *; | [A]US3224644 (JOHN DAVIS WILLIAM) [A] 1,13,14 * column 2, line 17 - line 31; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE838114 (MÖCKESCH E) | by applicant | EP19970113796 |