EP1111890 - Automatic (dynamic) network skill-based routing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2009/13] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St Laurent, Québec H4S 2A9 / CA | ||
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA | ||
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allen, Rosanne J. 443 Runnymede Road Toronto, Ontario, M6S 2Y9 / CA | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Boyce, Conor, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | Boyce, Conor, et al F. R. Kelly & Co., 27 Clyde Road, Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 00650185.2 | 13.11.2000 | [2001/26] | Priority number, date | US19990471143 | 23.12.1999 Original published format: US 471143 | [2001/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1111890 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1111890 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | [2004/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1111890 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/523, H04Q3/64 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
H04M3/5233 (EP);
H04M3/5237 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/26] | H04M3/523, H04M7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/41] |
Former [2001/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Automatische und dynamische auf Geschicklichkeit basierte Netzwerkleitweglenkung | [2001/26] | English: | Automatic (dynamic) network skill-based routing | [2001/26] | French: | Acheminement automatique et dynamique dans un réseau basé sur l'habileté | [2001/26] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 20.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5946387 (MILOSLAVSKY ALEC [US]) [X] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [X]US5970065 (MILOSLAVSKY ALEC [US]) [X] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [X]US5940497 (MILOSLAVSKY ALEC [US]) [X] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [X]US5991391 (MILOSLAVSKY ALEC [US]) [X] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0920224 (ADVANTIS [US]) [X] 1-23 * the whole document * |