EP1061603 - Antenna structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2006 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Filtronic LK Oy Takatie 6 90440 Kempele / FI | [2000/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Isohätälä, Anne Kellontie 73 90820 Kello / FI | 02 /
Tarvas, Suvi Paulaharjuntie 37 90530 Oulu / FI | 03 /
Mikkola, Jyrki Salpatie 2 C 1 69600 Kaustinen / FI | [2005/08] |
Former [2000/51] | 01 /
Isohätälä, Anne Kellontie 73 90820 Kello / FI | ||
02 /
Tarvas, Suvi Tapiontie 4 A 12 90570 Oulu / FI | |||
03 /
Mikkola, Jyrki Haukkakaarto 17 A 4 90450 Kempele / FI | Representative(s) | Kupiainen, Juhani Kalervo Berggren Oy Ab Lentokatu 2 90460 Oulunsalo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2000/51] | Kupiainen, Juhani c/o Oulun Patenttitoimisto, Berggren Oy Ab, Teknologiantie 14 D 90570 Oulu / FI | Application number, filing date | 00660107.4 | 12.06.2000 | [2000/51] | Priority number, date | FI19990001359 | 14.06.1999 Original published format: FI 991359 | [2000/51] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1061603 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1061603 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | [2002/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1061603 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/24, H01Q9/04, H01Q9/30, H01Q5/00 | [2000/51] | CPC: |
H01Q1/243 (EP,US);
H01Q1/244 (EP,US);
H01Q5/371 (EP,US);
H01Q5/40 (EP,US);
H01Q9/0421 (EP,US);
H01Q9/0442 (EP,US);
H01Q9/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2003/21] |
Former [2000/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Antennenstruktur | [2000/51] | English: | Antenna structure | [2000/51] | French: | Structure d' antenne | [2000/51] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/06] | 17.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT | 25.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.04.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 06.04.2005 | [2007/35] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4914714 (TAMURA YOSHIHARU [JP]) [X] 1,2,7 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0833455 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [X] 1,2 * page 7, line 9 - page 8, line 40 * * figures 13,14 *; | [X]EP0843376 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1067628 (FILTRONIC LK OY [FI]) [E] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [E]GB2347560 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [E] 1,2,7 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1030401 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1,7 * page 6, line 54 - page 9, line 49 * * figure 2 *; | [A]EP0523867 (TECHNOPHONE LTD [GB]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]JPH04196907 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP, et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]US5764190 (MURCH ROSS DAVID [HK], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | Examination | WO9718600 | WO9734377 | WO9903166 |