Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1081776
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
03.09.2004 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] |
14.04.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
14.04.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
14.04.2004 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.01.2004 |
New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.01.2004 |
New entry: Period of grace R.85b EPC 1973: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
19.12.2003 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 04.02.2004 [2004/06] |
29.10.2003 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
29.10.2003 |
Deletion: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.10.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.09.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.09.2003 |
Deletion: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.09.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.09.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.03.2003 |
Publication of search report |
published on 14.05.2003 [2003/20] |
30.08.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
25.01.2002 |
Change - applicant |
published on 13.03.2002 [2002/11] |
19.01.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.03.2001 [2001/10] |