EP1109322 - Arrangement and method for restricting word length [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [2001/25] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kukkula, Ilari Alppitie 7 as 55 90530 Oulu / FI | 02 /
Valtavaara, Juha Matilaisentie 6 A 3 90570 Oulu / FI | [2006/14] |
Former [2001/25] | 01 /
Kukkula, Llari Alppitie 7 as 55 90530 Oulu / FI | ||
02 /
Valtavaara, Juha Matilaisentie 6 A 3 90570 Oulu / FI | Representative(s) | Brockman, Pertti Erik, et al Kolster Oy Ab Elektroniikkatie 8 90590 Oulu / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2001/25] | Brockman, Pertti Erik, et al Kolster Oy Ab, P.O. Box 148, Iso Roobertinkatu 23 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 00660181.9 | 06.10.2000 | [2001/25] | Priority number, date | FI19990002294 | 22.10.1999 Original published format: FI 992294 | [2001/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1109322 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1109322 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | [2004/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1109322 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/00, G06F7/52 | [2004/02] | CPC: |
H04B1/707 (EP,US);
H04B2201/70707 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/25] | H04B1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/40] |
Former [2001/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Anordnung und Verfahren zur Beschränkung der Wortlänge | [2001/25] | English: | Arrangement and method for restricting word length | [2001/25] | French: | Arrangement et méthode pour restreindre la longueur de mots | [2001/25] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/26] | 26.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 03.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.08.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS60175142 ; | [A]US5941941 (HASEGAWA SATOSHI [JP]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * column 2, line 9 - line 29 * * column 2, line 59 - column 4, line 15 * | [Y] - SEOKJUN LEE ET AL, "Finite wordlength effects analysis and wordlength optimization of Dolby digital audio decoder", CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, 1998. ISCAS '98. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1998 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MONTEREY, CA, USA 31 MAY-3 JUNE 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980531), ISBN 0-7803-4455-3, pages 209 - 212, XP010289520 [Y] 1-3,7,8,13-15,17,18 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCAS.1998.698796 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860128), vol. 010, no. 022, Database accession no. (P - 424), & JP60175142 A 19850909 (FUJITSU KK) [Y] 1-3,7,8,13-15,17,18 * abstract * | [A] - IL-TAEK LIM ET AL, "Fixed-point analysis and simulations of AC-3 algorithm", APPLICATIONS OF SIGNAL PROCESSING TO AUDIO AND ACOUSTICS, 1997. 1997 IEEE ASSP WORKSHOP ON NEW PALTZ, NY, USA 19-22 OCT. 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19971019), ISBN 0-7803-3908-8, page 4pp, XP010248191 [A] 1-21 * abstract * |