EP1118531 - Uneven terrain vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ÉCOLE POLYTECHNIQUE FÉDÉRALE DE LAUSANNE DPR-Ecublens 1015 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states ECOLE POLYTECHNIQUE FEDERALE DE LAUSANNE DPR-Ecublens 1015 Lausanne / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crausaz, Yann Ch. Rojoux 14 1231 Conches / CH | 02 /
Merminod, Baptiste Bd Paderewski 26 1800 Vevey / CH | 03 /
Wiesendanger, Markus Av. du Léman 4 1006 Lausanne / CH | 04 /
Siegwart, Roland Ch. de la Dôle 4 1024 Ecublens / CH | 05 /
Lauria, Michel Ch. de la Suettaz 15 1008 Prilly / CH | 06 /
Piguet, Ralph Rte de la Foule 12 1315 La Sarraz / CH | [2001/30] | Representative(s) | Ganguillet, Cyril, et al ABREMA SA Avenue du Théâtre 16 P.O. Box 5027 1002 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Ganguillet, Cyril, et al ABREMA Agence Brevets & Marques Ganguillet Avenue du Théâtre 16 P.O. Box 5027 1002 Lausanne / CH | ||
Former [2001/30] | Ganguillet, Cyril, et al ABREMA Agence Brevets & Marques Ganguillet & Humphrey Avenue du Théâtre 16 Case postale 2065 1002 Lausanne / CH | Application number, filing date | 00810054.7 | 21.01.2000 | [2001/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1118531 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B62D61/10 | [2001/30] | CPC: |
A61G5/06 (EP);
A61G5/1051 (EP);
B60G21/045 (EP);
B60G5/00 (EP);
B62D61/10 (EP);
B62K5/01 (EP);
B60G2300/07 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | [2002/16] |
Former [2001/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Fahrzeug für unebenes Gelände | [2001/30] | English: | Uneven terrain vehicle | [2001/30] | French: | Véhicule pour terrain accidenté | [2001/30] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/14] | 10.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2652053 (SAVARD FRANCK, et al) [X] 1-4 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0399964 (BEI CLAUDIO DE [IT]) [X] 1-4 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4664208 (HORIUCHI TADANORI [JP], et al) [A] 1,6 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]US4223904 (MCCOLL BRUCE J) [A] 1,7 * figure 9 *; | [A]BE569442 (E.MEILI) [A] 1 * the whole document * |