EP1022767 - Method for mounting semiconductor chips [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2000 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.01.2001 [2001/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ESEC SA Hinterbergstrasse 32, Postfach 5503 6330 Cham / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/30] | For all designated states Esec SA Hinterbergstrasse 32, Postfach 5503 6330 Cham / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marty, Felix Samstagernstrasse 56 8832 Wollerau / CH | [2000/30] | Representative(s) | Falk, Urs Patentanwaltsbüro Dr. Urs Falk Eichholzweg 9A 6312 Steinhausen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | Falk, Urs, Dr. Patentanwaltsbüro Dr. Urs Falk, Eichholzweg 9A 6312 Steinhausen / CH | ||
Former [2000/30] | Falk, Urs, Dr. ESEC Management SA, Hinterbergstrasse 32, Postfach 5503 6330 Cham / CH | Application number, filing date | 00810055.4 | 21.01.2000 | [2000/30] | Priority number, date | CH19990000116 | 21.01.1999 Original published format: CH 11699 | [2000/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1022767 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00 | [2000/30] | CPC: |
H01L21/67144 (EP);
H01L21/67259 (EP);
H01L21/67294 (EP);
H01L21/681 (EP);
H01L21/6836 (EP);
H01L24/83 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren für die Montage von Halbleiterchips | [2000/30] | English: | Method for mounting semiconductor chips | [2000/30] | French: | Méthode pour le montage de puces semiconductrices | [2000/30] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5851848 (BALAMURUGAN SUBRAMANIAN [SG]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 46 * |