EP1036821 - Process for the preparation of thiazine-indigo compounds and of new intermediates therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant Finance (BVI) Limited Citco Building, Wickhams Cay, P.O. Box 662 Road Town, Tortola / VG | [2000/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Borchert, Till 3, Croisée des Lys 68300 Saint Louis / FR | 02 /
Kaul, Bansi Lal Bruckackerstrasse 48 4105 Biel-Benken / CH | 03 /
Piastra, Bruno 12, Rue Lavoisier 68330 Huningue / FR | 04 /
Wolf, Valérie 15A, Rue du Général de Gaulle 68990 Galfingue / FR | 05 /
Rothe, Petra Frankfurter-Strasse 69 65779 Kelkheim / DE | 06 /
Unverdorben, Leonhard Johann-Peter-Bach-Strasse 3 61130 Nidderau / DE | [2000/38] | Representative(s) | D'haemer, Jan Constant, et al Clariant International Ltd. Industrial Property Department Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | D'haemer, Jan Constant, et al Clariant International Ltd., Industrial Property Department, Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | Application number, filing date | 00810221.2 | 16.03.2000 | [2000/38] | Priority number, date | GB19990006120 | 18.03.1999 Original published format: GB 9906120 | GB19990018805 | 11.08.1999 Original published format: GB 9918805 | [2000/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1036821 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1036821 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C09B7/00, C07D513/04, C07C323/62, C07C323/63, C07D279/16, C08K5/46, C09D5/00, C09D11/00, // (C07D513/04, 279:00, 235:00) | [2000/38] | CPC: |
C09D11/32 (EP,US);
C07D279/00 (KR);
A61K8/49 (EP,US);
A61Q1/02 (EP,US);
C07C323/62 (EP,US);
C07C323/63 (EP,US);
C07D279/16 (EP,US);
C09B7/00 (EP,US);
C09D5/035 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Thiazin-Indigoverbindungen und von neuen Zwischenprodukten dafür | [2000/38] | English: | Process for the preparation of thiazine-indigo compounds and of new intermediates therefor | [2000/38] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de composés thiazine-indigo et de nouveaux intermédiaires pour ceux-ci | [2000/38] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/06] | 14.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.01.2004 | BE | 28.01.2004 | CY | 28.01.2004 | FI | 28.01.2004 | IT | 28.01.2004 | NL | 28.01.2004 | IE | 16.03.2004 | LU | 16.03.2004 | MC | 31.03.2004 | DK | 28.04.2004 | GR | 28.04.2004 | SE | 28.04.2004 | ES | 09.05.2004 | PT | 28.06.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
CY | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
IT | 28.01.2004 | ||
NL | 28.01.2004 | ||
IE | 16.03.2004 | ||
LU | 16.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
ES | 09.05.2004 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
CY | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
NL | 28.01.2004 | ||
IE | 16.03.2004 | ||
LU | 16.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
ES | 09.05.2004 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
NL | 28.01.2004 | ||
IE | 16.03.2004 | ||
LU | 16.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
ES | 09.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
IE | 16.03.2004 | ||
LU | 16.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
ES | 09.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
LU | 16.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
ES | 09.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
ES | 09.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
ES | 09.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
ES | 09.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 28.01.2004 | |
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 28.01.2004 | |
SE | 28.04.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3803139 (KAUL B) [X] 21,22 * column 3, line 49 - line 60; example - * [A] 1-20; | [AD]DE2536120 (BASF AG) [AD] 1-22 * example -; claim - *; | [XA]WO9832800 (CLARIANT FINANCE BVI LTD [CH], et al) [X] 21,22 * page 32, paragraph 4 - page 33, paragraph L; claims 1,7-10 * * page 10, paragraph 3 - page 11, paragraph 1 * [A] 1-20; | [AD] - B.L.KAUL, "studies on heterocyclic colouring matters...", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA., VERLAG HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA. BASEL., CH, (1974), vol. 57, no. 8, ISSN 0018-019X, pages 2664 - 78, XP002140383 [AD] 1-22 * page 2667, scheme 5 *; page 2675, paragraph L - page 2676, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.19740570846 |