EP1146376 - Method and apparatus for the controlled conditioning of scanning probes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.2005 [2005/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Triple-O Microscopy GmbH Behlertstrasse 26 14469 Potsdam / DE | [2001/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pohl, Dieter W. Felsenhofstrasse 10 8134 Adliswil / CH | 02 /
Bouhelier, Alexandre Mittlere Strasse 39 4056 Basel / CH | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Barth, Carl Otto, et al ABACUS Patentanwälte Klocke Späth Barth Zürichstrasse 34 8134 Adliswil/Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | Barth, Carl Otto, Dipl.-Ing., et al ABACUS Patentanwälte Klocke Späth Barth European Patent and Trademark Attorneys Zürichstrasse 34 8134 Adliswil/Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2004/15] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2001/42] | Barth, Carl Otto, Dipl.-Ing. Barth & Partner Zürichstrasse 34 8134 Adliswil/Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 00810319.4 | 12.04.2000 | [2001/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1146376 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/00 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
G01Q60/22 (EP,US);
B82Y20/00 (US);
B82Y35/00 (US);
G02B6/241 (EP,US);
G02B6/262 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2002/27] |
Former [2001/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur kontrollierten Bearbeitung von Abtastsonden | [2001/42] | English: | Method and apparatus for the controlled conditioning of scanning probes | [2001/42] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour le conditionnement controlé de sondes à balayage | [2001/42] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/18] | 18.04.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.08.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 06.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/06] | 03.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.05.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 30.04.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 28.04.2003 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2004/02] | 02.02.2004 | Resumption of proceedings | [2004/02] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH07198314 ; | [X]JPH06128800 ; | [X]US5038034 (FUJITA SHIGETO [JP]) [X] 1,7,8 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 5 *; | [X]US5548117 (NAKAGAWA TOHRU [JP]) [X] 1,3,8 * column 3, line 21 - line 40 * * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 12 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US5838005 (MAJUMDAR ARUNAVA [US], et al) [X] 1,3,8,13 * page 8, line 10 - line 61; figure 8A *; | [X]JPH11248720 ; | [X]US5686207 (SUDA MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3 * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 3 *; | [X]WO9908099 (DRESDEN EV INST FESTKOERPER [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,7,8 * page 11, line 13 - page 12, line 27; figure 6 *; | [X]EP0763742 (KANAGAWA KAGAKU GIJUTSU AKAD [JP]) [X] 8,13 * column 57, line 40 - column 59, line 17; figures 53C,93-97 * | [DXAY] - MULIN D ET AL, "USE OF SOLID ELECTROLYTIC EROSION FOR GENERATING NANO-APERTURE NEAR-FIELD COLLECTORS", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS,US,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, (19970728), vol. 71, no. 4, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 437 - 439, XP000698243 [DX] 1,6,8-12 * the whole document * [A] 3-5,7 [Y] 13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.120439 | [XAY] - VIKRAM C S ET AL, "CHEMICAL SILVER COATING OF FIBER TIPS IN NEAR-FIELD SCANNING OPTICAL MICROSCOPY", OPTICS LETTERS,US,OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, (19990515), vol. 24, no. 10, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 682 - 684, XP000846964 [X] 8 * page 682, column R, paragraph L - page 683, column R, paragraph L * [A] 1,3,4 [Y] 13 | [X] - "IN SITU SHARPENING OF ATOMIC FORCE MICROSCOPE TIPS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,US,IBM CORP. NEW YORK, (19950201), vol. 38, no. 2, ISSN 0018-8689, page 637, XP000502713 [X] 1,2,7-9 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. 11, & JP07198314 A 19950801 (JEOL LTD) [X] 1,2,7-9 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940811), vol. 018, no. 430, Database accession no. (C - 1236), & JP06128800 A 19940510 (NIKON CORP) [X] 1,8,9 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991222), vol. 1999, no. 14, & JP11248720 A 19990917 (SEIKO INSTRUMENTS INC) [X] 1,3,8,9 * abstract * |