EP1178044 - Tocopherylalkoxylates, their preparation and their use in cosmetic and pharmaceutical forms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. W. Kolb AG Maienbrunnenstrasse 1 8908 Hedingen / CH | [2002/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nägeli, Ivo 6300 Zug / CH | 02 /
Fraeys de Veubeke, Benoit 8906 Bonstetten / CH | 03 /
Kropf, Urs 8910 Affoltern a. Albis / CH | 04 /
Meyer, Marie-Sophie Friedhofstrasse 73 8906 Bonstetten / CH | 05 /
Möhle, Horst Lothar 8907 Wettswil / CH | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 6940 8002 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/07] | Hug Interlizenz AG Nordstrasse 31 8035 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 00810703.9 | 04.08.2000 | [2002/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1178044 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1178044 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D311/72, C08F283/06, A61K31/355, A61P17/00, A61K7/06 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
A61Q19/00 (EP);
A61K31/765 (EP);
A61K8/678 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
C07D311/72 (EP);
C08G65/2612 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/43] |
Former [2002/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Tocopherylalkoxylate, deren Herstellung und Verwendung in kosmetischen und pharmazeutischen Formulierungen | [2002/06] | English: | Tocopherylalkoxylates, their preparation and their use in cosmetic and pharmaceutical forms | [2002/06] | French: | Tocophérylalkoxylates, leur préparation et leur usage dans des formulations cosmétiques et pharmaceutiques | [2002/06] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/20] | 18.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.10.2003 | ES | 01.10.2003 | FI | 01.10.2003 | GB | 01.10.2003 | IE | 01.10.2003 | IT | 01.10.2003 | NL | 01.10.2003 | DK | 01.01.2004 | GR | 01.01.2004 | SE | 01.01.2004 | PT | 01.03.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | CY | 01.10.2003 | |
ES | 01.10.2003 | ||
FI | 01.10.2003 | ||
GB | 01.10.2003 | ||
IE | 01.10.2003 | ||
IT | 01.10.2003 | ||
NL | 01.10.2003 | ||
DK | 01.01.2004 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
Former [2007/08] | CY | 01.10.2003 | |
ES | 01.10.2003 | ||
FI | 01.10.2003 | ||
GB | 01.10.2003 | ||
IE | 01.10.2003 | ||
NL | 01.10.2003 | ||
DK | 01.01.2004 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/45] | FI | 01.10.2003 | |
GB | 01.10.2003 | ||
IE | 01.10.2003 | ||
NL | 01.10.2003 | ||
DK | 01.01.2004 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 01.10.2003 | |
IE | 01.10.2003 | ||
NL | 01.10.2003 | ||
DK | 01.01.2004 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 01.10.2003 | |
IE | 01.10.2003 | ||
NL | 01.10.2003 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | FI | 01.10.2003 | |
NL | 01.10.2003 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 01.10.2003 | |
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 01.01.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5235073 (KIM YOUNG D [KR], et al) [DA] 1-9* column 1 - column 14 *; | [DX]WO9962896 (KIM YOUNG DAE [KR], et al) [DX] 1,2,7-9 * the whole document * |