05.12.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] |
28.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] |
01.09.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] |
04.08.2006 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] |
28.07.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2006 [2006/35] |
14.07.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2006 [2006/33] |
19.05.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.06.2006 [2006/25] |
14.04.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] |
24.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.04.2006 [2006/15] |
10.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |
12.08.2005 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.09.2005 [2005/39] |
10.08.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.07.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
26.07.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.03.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.12.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.11.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.07.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.07.2004 |
First examination report |
|
14.07.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.08.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.08.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.04.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
04.01.2002 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 20.02.2002 [2002/08] |
30.11.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.01.2002 [2002/03] |
13.04.2001 |
Publication of search report |
published on 30.05.2001 [2001/22] |
13.04.2001 |
Change - classification |
published on 30.05.2001 [2001/22] |
12.01.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.02.2001 [2001/09] |