Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1079037 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2005 | B1 | EP1079037 | 30.05.2001 | A3 | EP1079037 | 28.02.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CH153299 | 20.08.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE305544T | 15.10.2005 | T1 | Priority number | Date | CH153299 | 20.08.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50011244D1 | 09.02.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | CH153299 | 20.08.1999 |