EP1084664 - Movable lying support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meili & Co. AG Sarmenstorferstrasse 3 5615 Fahrwangen / CH | [2001/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meili, Peter Eggenstrasse 7 5615 Fahrwangen / CH | 02 /
Pfister, Adolf Talbachstrasse 24 5722 Gränichen / CH | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Keller Schneider Patent- und Markenanwälte AG (Zürich) Beethovenstrasse 49 Postfach 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | Patentanwaltsbüro Feldmann AG Kanalstrasse 17 8152 Glattbrugg / CH | Application number, filing date | 00810808.6 | 07.09.2000 | [2001/12] | Priority number, date | CH19990001711 | 17.09.1999 Original published format: CH 171199 | [2001/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1084664 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A47C23/06 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
A47C23/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/12] | Extension states | AL | 10.09.2001 | LT | 10.09.2001 | LV | 10.09.2001 | MK | 10.09.2001 | RO | 10.09.2001 | SI | 10.09.2001 | Title | German: | Mobiler Liegenunterbau | [2001/12] | English: | Movable lying support | [2001/12] | French: | Support de couchage mobile | [2001/12] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/45] | 17.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/36] | 02.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE4212037 (SCHLESINGER CHRISTIAN [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2,9,11,13-15; | [A]US5070560 (WILKINSON JOHN W [US]) [A] 1,10,12 * figure -; claims 1-4 *; | [A]DE4302778 (LAENGLE MELANIE [AT]) [A] 4 * abstract *; | [A]DE4409093 (WESEMANN ROLF [DE], et al) [A] 8 * abstract * | by applicant | DE3933816 | EP0243383 | EP0116237 |