EP1116670 - Piston for closing a cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stebler & Co.AG Brügglistrasse 4 4208 Nunningen / CH | [2004/27] |
Former [2001/29] | For all designated states STebler & Co. AG Brügglistrasse 4 4208 Nunningen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stössel, Willy Gartenstrasse 7 4147 Aesch / CH | [2001/29] | Representative(s) | Eder, Carl E., et al Braunpat Braun Eder AG Patent - Marken - Rechtsanwälte Reussstrasse 22 Postfach 4015 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | Eder, Carl E., et al Patentanwaltsbüro EDER AG Lindenhofstrasse 40 4052 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 00810833.4 | 15.09.2000 | [2001/29] | Priority number, date | CH20000000046 | 11.01.2000 Original published format: CH 462000 | [2001/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1116670 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1116670 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/76, B65D83/00 | [2001/29] | CPC: |
B65D83/0005 (EP,US);
B65D2205/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/29] | Title | German: | Kolben zum Verschliessen einer Kartusche | [2001/29] | English: | Piston for closing a cartridge | [2001/29] | French: | Piston pour fermer une cartouche | [2001/29] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/29] | 20.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 31.03.2004 | ES | 31.03.2004 | FI | 31.03.2004 | FR | 31.03.2004 | GB | 31.03.2004 | IE | 31.03.2004 | IT | 31.03.2004 | NL | 31.03.2004 | DK | 30.06.2004 | GR | 30.06.2004 | SE | 30.06.2004 | PT | 31.08.2004 | AT | 15.09.2004 | LU | 15.09.2004 | BE | 30.09.2004 | MC | 30.09.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | CY | 31.03.2004 | |
ES | 31.03.2004 | ||
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
FR | 31.03.2004 | ||
GB | 31.03.2004 | ||
IE | 31.03.2004 | ||
IT | 31.03.2004 | ||
NL | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
AT | 15.09.2004 | ||
LU | 15.09.2004 | ||
BE | 30.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2007/08] | CY | 31.03.2004 | |
ES | 31.03.2004 | ||
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
FR | 31.03.2004 | ||
GB | 31.03.2004 | ||
IE | 31.03.2004 | ||
NL | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
AT | 15.09.2004 | ||
LU | 15.09.2004 | ||
BE | 30.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
FR | 31.03.2004 | ||
GB | 31.03.2004 | ||
IE | 31.03.2004 | ||
NL | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
AT | 15.09.2004 | ||
BE | 30.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
GB | 31.03.2004 | ||
IE | 31.03.2004 | ||
NL | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
AT | 15.09.2004 | ||
BE | 30.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
GB | 31.03.2004 | ||
IE | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
BE | 30.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
GB | 31.03.2004 | ||
IE | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
GB | 31.03.2004 | ||
IE | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
GB | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
GB | 31.03.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
SE | 30.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2071268 (FISCHBACH A KUNSTSTOFF KG) [A] 1 * page 4, line 19 - line 23; figures 4-6 *; | [A]DE19714331 (RITTER FRANK [DE]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]EP0900599 (SONOCO PRODUCTS CO [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * |