EP1090746 - Multilayered plastic foil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/02] |
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2001/15] | For all designated states SIG Pack Systems AG Industriestrasse 8222 Beringen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nettesheim, Stefan Kornhausstrasse 34 8006 Zürich / CH | [2001/15] | Representative(s) | Clerc, Natalia, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/06] | Clerc, Natalia, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2001/15] | Münch, Otto, Dipl.-Ing., et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 00810906.8 | 03.10.2000 | [2001/15] | Priority number, date | CH19990001835 | 07.10.1999 Original published format: CH 183599 | [2001/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1090746 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1090746 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | [2001/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1090746 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/00, B32B27/32, B32B27/20 | [2001/45] | CPC: |
B65D65/16 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B27/32 (US);
B32B7/023 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/31 (US);
B32B2307/402 (US);
B32B2307/412 (US);
B32B2310/0825 (US);
B32B2310/0831 (US);
B32B2323/00 (US);
B32B2439/00 (US);
Y10T428/1317 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1393 (EP,US);
Y10T428/26 (EP,US);
Y10T428/261 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2826 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/15] | B32B27/00, B32B27/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/15] | Title | German: | Mehrschichtige Kunstofffolie | [2001/15] | English: | Multilayered plastic foil | [2001/15] | French: | Feuille multicouche plastique | [2001/15] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/03] | 13.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.01.2006 | FI | 11.01.2006 | IE | 11.01.2006 | DK | 11.04.2006 | GR | 12.04.2006 | ES | 22.04.2006 | PT | 12.06.2006 | AT | 03.10.2006 | LU | 03.10.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/36] | FI | 11.01.2006 | |
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
DK | 11.04.2006 | ||
GR | 12.04.2006 | ||
ES | 22.04.2006 | ||
PT | 12.06.2006 | ||
AT | 03.10.2006 | ||
LU | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 11.01.2006 | |
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
DK | 11.04.2006 | ||
GR | 12.04.2006 | ||
ES | 22.04.2006 | ||
PT | 12.06.2006 | ||
AT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/13] | FI | 11.01.2006 | |
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
DK | 11.04.2006 | ||
ES | 22.04.2006 | ||
PT | 12.06.2006 | ||
AT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | FI | 11.01.2006 | |
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
DK | 11.04.2006 | ||
ES | 22.04.2006 | ||
PT | 12.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | FI | 11.01.2006 | |
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
IT | 11.01.2006 | ||
DK | 11.04.2006 | ||
ES | 22.04.2006 | ||
PT | 12.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | FI | 11.01.2006 | |
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
DK | 11.04.2006 | ||
ES | 22.04.2006 | ||
PT | 12.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 11.01.2006 | |
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
DK | 11.04.2006 | ||
PT | 12.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | FI | 11.01.2006 | |
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
PT | 12.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 11.01.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XPA]JP2000238835 ; | [A]JPH1114979 ; | [X]WO9702948 (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 7, lines 1-15 * * page 8, lines 6-14 * * figures 1-3 * | [XPA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 12, & JP2000238835 A 20000905 (KEIHAN CELLOPHANE KK) [XP] 1,2,4,8 * abstract * [A] 3,5 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990430), vol. 1999, no. 04, & JP11014979 A 19990122 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY DEVICES CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |