EP1106717 - Cylinder for carding machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.2003 [2003/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Klosterstrasse 20 8406 Winterthur / CH | [2001/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmid, René Im Eggli 3 8525 Niederneunforn / CH | [2001/24] | Application number, filing date | 00811111.4 | 22.11.2000 | [2001/24] | Priority number, date | CH19990002224 | 03.12.1999 Original published format: CH 222499 | [2001/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1106717 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | D01G15/16 | [2001/24] | CPC: |
D01G15/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT, TR [2002/10] |
Former [2001/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Trommel für Kardiermaschinen | [2001/24] | English: | Cylinder for carding machines | [2001/24] | French: | Tambour pour les machines de cardage | [2001/24] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/04] | 14.12.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 03.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/50] | 10.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.01.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR1438937 (COTTON SILK & MAN MADE FIBRES) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 5; | [YA]DE4018339 (HOLLINGSWORTH GMBH [DE]) [Y] 5 * figure 2; claim 1 * [A] 1; | [YA]GB762453 (GILBERT EDWARD FISHER) [Y] 5 * column 1, line 25 - line 32; figure 2 * [A] 1; | [DA]DE3531850 (SCHUBERT & SALZER MASCHINEN [DE]) [DA] 1 * column 2, line 13 - line 33; figure 1 * |