EP1208812 - Modular colour key, dental kit , reference element and method for selecting a colour [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coltène AG Feldwiesenstrasse 20 9450 Altstätten (SG) / CH | [2002/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dietschi, Didier Chemin de la Chapelle 19 1233 Bernex / CH | 02 /
Lampl, Stephan Falzigenweg 1 9450 Lüchingen / CH | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | Hepp, Dieter, et al Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | Hepp, Dieter, et al Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG, Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | Application number, filing date | 00811130.4 | 28.11.2000 | [2002/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1208812 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61C19/10, G01J3/52 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
G01J3/528 (EP,US);
A61C19/10 (EP,US);
G01J3/508 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [2003/08] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Modularer Farbschlüssel, Dentalkit, Referenzelement und Verfahren zur Farbauswahl | [2002/22] | English: | Modular colour key, dental kit , reference element and method for selecting a colour | [2002/22] | French: | Dispositif d'identification des couleurs, kit dentaire, élément de référence et méthode pour sélectionner une couleur | [2002/22] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/37] | 30.11.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.03.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 06.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/39] | 21.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.01.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.01.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US3964167 (YERKES JR JOHN G) [X] 1-3,9,11-13 * column 4, lines 3-44 * * column 5, lines 33-58 * * column 7, lines 21-46,57 - column 8, line 34; figures 1-6 * [A] 4,14-16 [Y] 7,10; | [Y]DE2641740 (LOHMILLER ROSE MARIE DR) [Y] 7 * page 2, lines 16-29; figures 1,3; claim 6 *; | [Y]US4115922 (ALDERMAN C GALE) [Y] 10* column 2, lines 15-26,61 - column 3, line 5; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | DE19509830 | US5743730 | DE19851134 |