EP1124259 - Cooling device for a power semiconductor module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/33] | Cooling device for a high power semiconductor module | ||
[2008/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [2009/07] |
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2001/33] | For all designated states ABB Semiconductors AG Haselstrasse 16 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaufmann, Stefan Neuhofstrasse 18 5600 Lenzburg / CH | [2001/33] | Representative(s) | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property (CH-LC/IP), Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2001/33] | ABB Patent Attorneys c/o ABB Business Services Ltd, Intellectual Property (SLE-I), Haselstrasse 16/699 5401 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 00811198.1 | 15.12.2000 | [2001/33] | Priority number, date | DE20001006215 | 11.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10006215 | [2001/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1124259 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1124259 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1124259 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01L25/07, H01L23/373, H01L23/36 | [2001/33] | CPC: |
H01L23/3733 (EP,US);
H01L21/4882 (EP,US);
H01L23/473 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/39] |
Former [2001/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kühlvorrichtung für ein Hochleistungs-Halbleitermodul | [2001/33] | English: | Cooling device for a power semiconductor module | [2008/45] | French: | Dissipateur de chaleur pour un module semi-conducteur de puissance | [2008/45] |
Former [2001/33] | Cooling device for a high power semiconductor module | ||
Former [2001/33] | Dissipateur de chaleur pour un module semi-conducteur à haute prestation | Examination procedure | 11.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/33] | 28.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19735531 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0661917 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [AD] 1-10 * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 47; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0471552 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 55; figures 3,5; claim 11 *; | [A]US5796049 (SCHNEIDER MICHAEL G [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5672433 (COOK ARNOLD J [US]) [A] 7,8 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 8 *; | [A]US5259436 (YUN DAVID I [US], et al) [A] 7,8 * column 6, line 48 - line 52 * | by applicant | EP0471552 |