EP1118313 - Gun for squeezing out bone cement with a mountable cement syringe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2005 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zimmer GmbH Sulzer Allee 8 8404 Winterthur / CH | [2004/43] |
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states Sulzer Orthopedics Ltd. Grabenstrasse 25 6340 Baar / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Overes, Tom Schlosshofstrasse 62 8400 Winterthur / CH | 02 /
Faoro, Francisco Schulhausstrasse 52 8002 Zürich / CH | [2001/30] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/07] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/09] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Gbr Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/30] | Sulzer Management AG KS/Patente/0007 Zürcherstrasse 12 8401 Winterthur / CH | Application number, filing date | 00811206.2 | 19.12.2000 | [2001/30] | Priority number, date | EP20000810038 | 18.01.2000 Original published format: EP 00810038 | [2001/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1118313 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1118313 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/46, B05C17/015 | [2001/30] | CPC: |
A61B17/8822 (EP);
B05C17/015 (EP);
A61F2002/30561 (EP);
A61F2002/4694 (EP);
A61F2250/0071 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/16] |
Former [2001/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Pistole zum Auspressen von Knochenzement mit einer aufsetzbaren Zementspritze | [2001/30] | English: | Gun for squeezing out bone cement with a mountable cement syringe | [2001/30] | French: | Pistolet pour pressuriser du ciment à os avec une seringue à ciment amovible | [2001/30] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/06] | 16.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 23.02.2005 | FI | 23.02.2005 | IE | 23.02.2005 | NL | 23.02.2005 | TR | 23.02.2005 | DK | 23.05.2005 | GR | 23.05.2005 | PT | 03.08.2005 | [2007/08] |
Former [2006/51] | FI | 23.02.2005 | |
IE | 23.02.2005 | ||
NL | 23.02.2005 | ||
TR | 23.02.2005 | ||
DK | 23.05.2005 | ||
GR | 23.05.2005 | ||
PT | 03.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 23.02.2005 | |
IE | 23.02.2005 | ||
NL | 23.02.2005 | ||
DK | 23.05.2005 | ||
GR | 23.05.2005 | ||
PT | 03.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 23.02.2005 | |
IE | 23.02.2005 | ||
DK | 23.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | FI | 23.02.2005 | |
DK | 23.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 23.02.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0108584 (DENTSPLY LTD [GB]) [Y] 1,4 * the whole document * [A] 13; | [Y]DE4022986 (HAHN MICHAEL [DE]) [Y] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5514135 (EARLE MICHAEL L [US]) [DA] 1-3,10 * column W *; | [A]US5431654 (NIC DAVID M [US]) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]EP0170120 (DRAENERT KLAUS DR MED HABIL); | [A]US3768472 (HODOSH M, et al); | [A]US2818999 (MILLER PAUL H) | by applicant | US5514135 |