EP1136808 - A system for automatically extracting and analysing residual solvents in material samples [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Squicciarini, Carlo Viale Kennedy No. 98, Villa Raverio 20045 Besana Brianza (MI) / IT | [2001/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/39] | Representative(s) | Robba, Pierpaolo, et al Interpatent S.R.L. Via Caboto, 35 10129 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | Robba, Pierpaolo, et al Interpatent, Via Caboto 35 10129 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 00830204.4 | 20.03.2000 | [2001/39] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1136808 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/00, G01N30/24, G01N1/34 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
G01N30/06 (EP,US);
G01N1/34 (EP,US);
G01N2030/062 (EP,US);
Y10T436/12 (EP,US);
Y10T436/25375 (EP,US);
Y10T436/25875 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/39] | Title | German: | Automatisches System für die Extraktion und Analyse von restlichen Lösungsmittel in Materialproben | [2001/39] | English: | A system for automatically extracting and analysing residual solvents in material samples | [2001/39] | French: | Système automatique pour l'extraction et l'analyse de solvants résiduels dans des échantillons | [2001/39] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/20] | 23.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/12] | 06.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5065614 (HARTMAN THOMAS G [US], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US5191211 (GORMAN JR WILLIAM B [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 20; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9627417 (DIONEX CORP [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5588988 (GERSTEL EBERHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0770869 (PERKIN ELMER CORP [US]) [Y] 1-8,10 * column 5, lines 26-30; figure 1 *; | [A]US5690828 (CLAY DALE LEE [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [Y]US5932482 (MARKELOV MICHAEL [US]) [Y] 1-8,10 * column 7, line 55 - column 8, line 10; figure 3 * * abstract *; | [Y]US5970804 (ROBBAT JR ALBERT [US]) [Y] 1-8,10 * abstract * * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 41; figure 8D * |