EP1046864 - Venturi meter with calibration pin for gas boilers with sealed combustion chamber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2003 [2003/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L.N. di NATALINI LINO & C. - S.r.l. Via Grazia Deledda, 10/12 62010-Montecassiano (MC) / IT | [2000/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Natalini, Lino Via Vanvitelli, 39 Macerata / IT | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | Baldi, Claudio Piazza Ghislieri, 3 60035 Jesi (Ancona) / IT | [2000/43] | Application number, filing date | 00830215.0 | 22.03.2000 | [2000/43] | Priority number, date | IT1999AN00013U | 23.03.1999 Original published format: IT AN990013 U | [2000/43] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1046864 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1046864 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | [2002/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F23N5/18 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
G01F1/44 (EP);
F23N5/188 (EP);
G01F25/10 (EP);
F23N2005/181 (EP);
F23N2227/20 (EP);
F23N2235/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/21] |
Former [2000/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Venturigerät für Gaskessel mit geschlossener Brennkammer | [2000/43] | English: | Venturi meter with calibration pin for gas boilers with sealed combustion chamber | [2000/43] | French: | Appareil venturi avec une broche d'étalonnage pour des chaudière à gaz avec une chambre à combustion étanche | [2000/43] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/49] | 04.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.04.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.04.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 31.03.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0790465 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] * abstract *; | [A]EP0205204 (TNO [NL]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE2313099 (CHAWLA JOGINDAR MOHAN DR ING) [A] 1 * figure - * |