EP1148456 - Maintenance system for shelters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.05.2006 [2006/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eudosia S.P.A. Via Mascheroni, 19 20145 Milan / IT | [2001/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feliziani, Pierpaolo Viale F.lli Rosselli, 55 63013 Grottammare (Ascoli Piceno) / IT | 02 /
Grassi, Maria Via Tortona, 18 15050 Montemarzino (Alessandria) / IT | [2001/43] | Representative(s) | Pezzoli, Ennio, et al Jacobacci & Perani S.p.A. Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/43] | Pezzoli, Ennio, et al Jacobacci & Perani S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 00830257.2 | 05.04.2000 | [2001/43] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1148456 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G08B25/10 | [2001/43] | CPC: |
G08B25/08 (EP);
G05B23/0259 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/43] | Title | German: | Instandsetzungsystem für Schutzräume | [2001/43] | English: | Maintenance system for shelters | [2001/43] | French: | Système de maintenance pour abris | [2001/43] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/22] | 02.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/20] | 09.12.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0978810 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-4,9-11,13,14 * column 4, lines 22-48 * * column 5, lines 42-46 * * column 7, line 33 - column 8, line 8 * [Y] 12; | [Y]WO9854426 (SIEMENS LTDA [BR], et al) [Y] 12 * figure 7 *; | [XY]FR2556533 (TELEMATIQUE SYSTEMES [FR]) [X] 1-5,7,8,11,13,14 * abstract * * page 4, columns 1-16 * * page 7, columns 27-30 * [Y] 6; | [Y]WO9820309 (SIRMANSHAHI AFSHIN [SE]) [Y] 6 * page 7, lines 10-15 * * page 7, line 31 - page 8, line 5 * |