Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] |
27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] |
02.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 04.04.2007 [2007/14] |
15.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] |
23.12.2005 | (Expected) grant | published on 08.02.2006 [2006/06] |
15.12.2005 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
15.12.2005 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
08.09.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.07.2005 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
15.07.2005 | Change - classification | published on 31.08.2005 [2005/35] |
15.07.2005 | Change - classification | published on 31.08.2005 [2005/35] |
07.01.2005 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
24.09.2004 | First examination report | |
22.09.2004 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
06.09.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.09.2003 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.02.2003 | Change - extension states | |
11.10.2002 | Definitive list of designations | published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] |
12.09.2002 | Renewal fee | |
03.05.2002 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] |
18.01.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.03.2002 [2002/10] |