Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1184953 | Global Dossier | 08.02.2006 | B1 | EP1184953 | 06.03.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP00830592 | 31.08.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60025904D1 | 20.04.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP00830592 | 31.08.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6414472 | 02.07.2002 | B1 | US2002047695 | 25.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP00830592 | 31.08.2000 |