EP1199801 - Circuit for current injection control in analog switches [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martini, Marco Via Floridia 20 95024 Acireale (Catania) / IT | [2002/17] | Representative(s) | Mittler, Enrico, et al Mittler & C. S.r.l. Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | Mittler, Enrico, et al Mittler & C. s.r.l., Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2004/10] | Gatti, Enrico Mittler & C. s.r.l. Via Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2002/17] | Mittler, Enrico c/o Mittler & C. s.r.l., Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 00830677.1 | 19.10.2000 | [2002/17] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1199801 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/16, H03K17/687 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
H03K17/162 (EP,US);
H03K17/6872 (EP,US);
H03K2217/0018 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/03] |
Former [2002/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schaltung zur injektionsstromsteuerung in Analogschaltern | [2002/17] | English: | Circuit for current injection control in analog switches | [2002/17] | French: | Circuit pour commander le courant d'injection dans des commutateurs analogiques | [2002/17] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2002 | Examination requested [2002/49] | 29.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/19] | 15.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4985647 (KAWADA SHIGERU [JP]) [X] 13 * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 55; figure 4 * [A] 1-12; | [A]GB2327544 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 32 - page 7, line 27; figures 2,3 *; | [A]JPS6074816 ; | [A]US5666082 (WILENKEN RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5111072 (SEIDEL DURBIN L [US]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]US6005433 (HALE ROBERT RUSSELL [US]) [DA] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850829), vol. 009, no. 212, Database accession no. (E - 339), & JP60074816 A 19850427 (FUJITSU KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |