EP1203719 - A process and device for conveying products, for instance for automatic packaging installations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cavanna S.p.A. Via Matteotti, 104 28077 Prato Sesia (NO) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states CAVANNA S.p.A. 104, Via Matteotti I-28077 Prato Sesia Novara / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guidetti, Dario Via A. Volta, 33/a 28075 Grignasco (Novara) / IT | [2002/19] | Representative(s) | Bosotti, Luciano, et al Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Bosotti, Luciano, et al Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Srl Via Maria Vittoria, 18 10123 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2002/19] | Bosotti, Luciano, et al c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 00830728.2 | 02.11.2000 | [2002/19] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1203719 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65B23/14, B65B57/14, B65G57/28 | [2002/19] | CPC: |
B65B23/14 (EP,US);
B65B57/14 (EP,US);
B65G57/20 (EP,US);
B65G57/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Fördern von Gegenständen, zum Beispiel in automatischen Verpackungsmaschinen | [2002/19] | English: | A process and device for conveying products, for instance for automatic packaging installations | [2002/19] | French: | Procédé et dispositf pour transporter des produits, par exemple dans des machines automatiques d'emballage | [2002/19] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 06.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/33] | 28.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB1152333 (SIG SCHWEIZ INDUSTRIEGES [CH]) [X] 1,11 * page 2, line 1 - line 94; figures 1,2 * [Y] 2,3,12,13; | [Y]DE20003754U (HAISS MANFRED [DE]) [Y] 2,3,12,13 * the whole document * |