EP1022596 - Heat-shrinkable tube for protection of optical fiber splices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.03.2006 [2006/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2000/30] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ) 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dumitriu, Ion Landsgangen 1 149 35 Nynäshamn / SE | [2000/30] | Representative(s) | Holmberg-Schwindt, Tor Martin, et al Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Holmberg, Martin Tor, et al Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2000/30] | Rosenquist, Per Olof Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB, P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 00850011.8 | 20.01.2000 | [2000/30] | Priority number, date | SE19990000174 | 20.01.1999 Original published format: SE 9900174 | [2000/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1022596 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1022596 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | [2001/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1022596 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38 | [2000/30] | CPC: |
G02B6/2558 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/30] |
Former [2000/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wärmeschrumpfbarer Schlauch zum Schutz von optischen Faserspleissen | [2000/30] | English: | Heat-shrinkable tube for protection of optical fiber splices | [2000/30] | French: | Manchon thermorétractable pour la protection d'épissures de fibres optiques | [2000/30] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/27] | 03.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS5855908 ; | [A]JPS6114611 ; | [XA]US4509820 (MURATA NORIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9-13,15 * column 3, line 43 - line 58; figures 10A,10B; example 9 * [A] 6,8,14,16; | [A]US4526732 (KAKII TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 3,11* column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 22 *; | [A]US4680449 (YAMADA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 3,11 * column 1, line 11 - line 52 *; | [A]WO9851127 (THERMOCERAMIX L L C [US], et al) [A] 1-5,9-13 * page 2, line 20 - page 4, line 32 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830622), vol. 007, no. 142, Database accession no. (P - 205), & JP58055908 A 19830402 (NIPPON DENSHIN DENWA KOSHA) [X] 1-5,7,9-13,15 * abstract * [A] 6,8,14,16 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860610), vol. 010, no. 162, Database accession no. (P - 466), & JP61014611 A 19860122 (FUJITSU KK) [A] 7,15 * abstract * |