EP1084745 - Device for emulsifying liquids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quomak Tervuursesteenweg 114 3001 Leuven / BE | For all designated states Concept, Techniek en Vakmanschap Moretusstraat 4 9120 Beveren / BE | [2001/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vleminckx, Yves Hodelindestraat 13 3020 Herent / BE | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Luys, Marie-José A.H., et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | Luys, Marie-José A.H., et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen, Livornostraat 7 1060 Brussel / BE | Application number, filing date | 00870177.3 | 11.08.2000 | [2001/12] | Priority number, date | BE19990000550 | 13.08.1999 Original published format: BE 9900550 | [2001/12] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1084745 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1084745 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | [2003/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B01F5/06, B01F7/00 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
B01F23/41 (EP);
B01F25/45 (EP);
B01F25/4511 (EP);
B01F2215/0431 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/12] | B01F3/08, B01F5/06, B01F7/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Emulsifieren von Flüssigkeiten | [2001/12] | English: | Device for emulsifying liquids | [2001/12] | French: | Dispositif d'emulsifaction de liquides | [2001/12] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4874248 (LUETZELSCHWAB WAYNE E [US]) [X] 1,2,6 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 23; figures 1,2,6 * * column 5, line 4 - line 15 * [Y] 3,4,7; | [X]FR1287425 (DEVOS JEAN) [X] 1,2,6 * the whole document *; | [X]FR1153206 (SEPARATION SA FRANC POUR LA) [X] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5632596 (ROSS JAMES C [US]) [Y] 3,4,7 * column 2, line 14 - column 3, line 57 * * column A * |