EP1146219 - Engine with cylinders in narrow V-arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2006 [2006/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Steyr Motorentechnik Ges.m.b.H. Steyrer Strasse 32 4300 St. Valentin / AT | [2001/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Visek, Tomas Schubertstrasse 8 4400 Steyr / AT | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Kovac, Werner MAGNA STEYR Fahrzeugtechnik AG & Co KG Patentabteilung/VI Liebenauer Hauptstrasse 317 8041 Graz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | Kovac, Werner MAGNA STEYR Fahrzeugtechnik AG & Co KG, Patentabteilung/VI, Liebenauer Hauptstrasse 317 8041 Graz / AT | ||
Former [2001/42] | Kovac, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. c/o MAGNA EUROPA AG Patentabteilung 2. Haidequerstrasse 3 1111 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 00890113.4 | 11.04.2000 | [2001/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1146219 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F02F7/00, F02B75/22 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
F02B75/221 (EP);
F02F7/0012 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/42] | Title | German: | Verbrennungsmotor mit Zylindern in enger V-Anordnung | [2001/42] | English: | Engine with cylinders in narrow V-arrangement | [2001/42] | French: | Moteur à combustion interne avec des cylindres disposés en V | [2001/42] | Examination procedure | 10.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 18.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/39] | 10.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9828532 (STEYR DAIMLER PUCH AG [AT], et al) [A] 1 * page 4, line 19 - page 6, line 7; figure - *; | [A]US1916292 (WOOLSON LIONEL M) [A] 1-4 * page 1, line 83 - page 2, line 77; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0651155 (WEBER SRL [IT]) [A] 1,5,6 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 42; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE2943757 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG [DE]) [A] 1,5,6 * page 4, paragraph 4 - page 7, paragraph 1; figure - *; | [DA]DE2922726 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG) | by applicant | DE2922726 | AT389740B | - Automobiltechnisches Handbuch, BUSSIEN, (19530101), pages 48 - 49 | - "Sechszylindermotoren mit kleinem V-Winkel", MTZ, (1990), vol. 51, page 415 |